EP0293818 - Process for the preparation of carbonyl compounds by isomerization of allylalcohols [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1996 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.04.1996 [1996/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kummer, Rudolf, Dr. Kreuzstrasse 6 D-6710 Frankenthal / DE | 02 /
Bertleff, Werner, Dr. Neuzenlache 3 D-6806 Viernheim / DE | 03 /
Roeper, Michael, Dr. Albert-Schweitzer-Strasse 10 D-6706 Wachenheim / DE | [1988/49] | Application number, filing date | 88108666.4 | 31.05.1988 | [1988/49] | Priority number, date | DE19873718897 | 05.06.1987 Original published format: DE 3718897 | [1988/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0293818 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0293818 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0293818 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/51, C07C47/19 | [1988/49] | CPC: |
C07C45/783 (EP,US);
C07C45/512 (EP,US);
C07C45/81 (EP,US);
C07C47/19 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Carbonylverbindungen durch Isomerisierung von Allylalkoholen | [1988/49] | English: | Process for the preparation of carbonyl compounds by isomerization of allylalcohols | [1988/49] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de dérivés carbonylés par isomérisation d'alcools allyliques | [1988/49] | Examination procedure | 26.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/34] | 30.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - J. OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, Band 297, 1985, Seiten C37-C40; K. FELFÖLDI et al.: "Transformation of organic compounds in the presence of metal complexes. I. Transformations of unsaturated alcohols with metal complex catalysts" | [A] - C.R. ACAD. SC. PARIS, 1976, t. 282, Serie C, Seiten 65-67; M. DEDIEU et al.: "Etude de transferts intramoléculaires d'hydrogène catalysés par les complexes RuH2L4 et RhHL4" |