EP0293015 - Device for the command of a railway track levelling and aligning machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.1994 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LES FILS D'AUGUSTE SCHEUCHZER S.A. Avenue du Mont-d'Or, 7 CH-1007 Lausanne / CH | [1988/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bühler, Fritz Chemin de Ruchoz CH-1024 Ecublens / CH | [1988/48] | Representative(s) | Jörchel, Dietrich R.A., et al c/o BUGNION S.A. 10, route de Florissant Case postale 375 1211 Genève 12 Champel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/48] | Jörchel, Dietrich R.A., et al c/o BUGNION S.A. 10, route de Florissant Case postale 375 CH-1211 Genève 12 Champel / CH | Application number, filing date | 88108740.7 | 02.07.1985 | [1988/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0293015 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0293015 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E01B35/06 | [1988/48] | CPC: |
E01B35/06 (EP);
E01B2203/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/48] | Title | German: | Steuervorrichtung für eine Eisenbahngleisnivellier- und -richtmaschine | [1988/48] | English: | Device for the command of a railway track levelling and aligning machine | [1988/48] | French: | Dispositif pour la commande d'une machine à niveler et riper une voie de chemin de fer | [1988/48] | Examination procedure | 05.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/28] | 27.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP85201055.2 / EP0207197 | Opposition(s) | 03.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.07.1992 | GB | 02.07.1992 | [1994/25] |
Former [1993/47] | GB | 02.07.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1951699 ; | [A]DE2001542 ; | [A]DE2241366 ; | [AD]EP0090098 (SCHEUCHZER FILS AUGUSTE [CH]) |