Designated contracting states | BE | | CH | | DE | | ES | | FR | | GB | | GR | | IT | | LI | | NL | | SE | | Examination procedure | 09.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | European patent granted | 29.09.1993 | Opposition procedure | 30.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.1994 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 21.09.1993 | | Event description: | LU: LAST PAID ANNUAL FEE | | Event date: | 26.11.1993 | | Event description: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Event date: | 21.09.1994 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | | Event date: | 07.12.1988 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE | | Event date: | 13.06.1990 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A3 | Designated State(s): | BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE | | Event date: | 29.09.1993 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE | | Event date: | 06.02.1991 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19901206 | | Event date: | 04.12.1991 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 19911021 | | Event date: | 04.11.1993 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 3884461 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19931104 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Event date: | 24.12.1993 | | Event description: | IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED | | Event date: | 28.02.1994 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GR FG4A | Code Expl.: | +VALIDATION IN GREECE | Free Format Text: | 3010109 | | Event date: | 16.11.1994 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2059437 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Event date: | 01.01.2002 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB IF02 | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01 | | Event date: | 30.05.1990 | | Event description: | MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION) | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K 31/71 | | Event date: | 31.01.1995 | | Event description: | SE: EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE IN SWEDEN | Ref Document Number: | 88108821.5 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | F | | Event date: | 04.07.1994 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE SPCF | Code Expl.: | APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED | Free Format Text: | 88108821 | | Event date: | 16.06.1997 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE SPCG | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED | Free Format Text: | 9490113, 931217, EXPIRES: 20081216 | | Event date: | 03.11.2004 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 732E | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977) | | Event date: | 24.11.2007 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20070511 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 02.01.2008 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20070619 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 28.06.2007 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20070628 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 27.04.2007 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20070427 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.06.2007 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20070629 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 12.06.2007 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20070612 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 25.06.1993 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 19930625 | Year of Fee Payment: | 06 | | Event date: | 07.05.2007 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20070507 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 05.06.2007 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20070605 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.04.2008 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20070605 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.05.2008 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Payment DATE: | 20070419 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 25.06.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Event date: | 25.06.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PFA | Code Expl.: | NAME/FIRM CHANGED | OWNER: | ABBOTT LABORATORIES | Free Format Text: | ABBOTT LABORATORIES# #ABBOTT PARK/IL (US) -TRANSFER TO- ABBOTT LABORATORIES# #ABBOTT PARK/IL (US) | | Event date: | 01.08.2008 | | Event description: | NL: CEASED DUE TO REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20080601 | | Event date: | 25.06.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB PE20 | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS | Expiry DATE: | 20080531 | | Event date: | 31.10.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20080602 | | Event date: | 31.10.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20080601 | | Event date: | 28.11.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20080531 | | Event date: | 16.09.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FD2A | Code Expl.: | -ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN | Effective DATE: | 20080602 | | Event date: | 30.06.2008 | | Event description: | BE: PATENT EXPIRED | OWNER: | *ABBOTT LABORATORIES | Effective DATE: | 20080601 | | Event date: | 19.08.2008 | | Event description: | SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED | | Event date: | 12.08.1993 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 24.04.1990 | | Event description: | SEARCH REPORT DESPATCHED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009013 | | Event date: | 22.10.1988 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 30.07.1994 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 30.07.1994 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |