EP0293885 - Antibiotic-polymer compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.1994 [1994/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 1 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES Abbott Park, Illinois 60064 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fu Lu, Mou-Ying 195 Grafton Court Lake Bluff Illinois 60044 / US | 02 /
Borodkin, Saul 14905 Imperial Drive Libertyville Township Illinois 60048 / US | [1988/49] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano Gardi Patents, Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Baaderstrasse 3 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88108821.5 | 01.06.1988 | [1988/49] | Priority number, date | US19870058499 | 05.06.1987 Original published format: US 58499 | [1988/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0293885 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0293885 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0293885 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/71, C07H17/08, A61K9/08, A61K9/20, A61K9/68, A61K9/18 | [1990/22] | CPC: |
A61K31/70 (EP,US);
A61K47/58 (EP,US);
A61K9/5042 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61K9/0056 (EP,US);
A61K9/0095 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/49] | C07H17/08, A61K31/71, A61K9/08, A61K9/20, A61K9/68 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/49] | Title | German: | Antibiotikum-Polymer Zusammensetzung | [1988/49] | English: | Antibiotic-polymer compositions | [1988/49] | French: | Compositions contenant une association antibiotique-polymère | [1988/49] | Examination procedure | 06.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 21.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0010437 (LILLY CO ELI [US]); | [A]EP0001871 ; | [A]EP0139891 (BTB IND CHIMICA [IT], et al); | [A]EP0180415 (TAISHO PHARMA CO LTD [JP]); | [AP]WO8704342 (KEY PHARMA [US]); | [AP]EP0232155 (ELAN CORP PLC [IE]); | [E]EP0302370 (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | [E]EP0312340 (APS RES LTD [GB]) |