EP0293898 - Low-tension quenching of ply twist/heatset yarn [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1994 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.1994 [1994/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nelson, Thomas Larson 7 Swain Avenue Georgetown Delaware 19947 / US | [1988/49] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88108872.8 | 03.06.1988 | [1988/49] | Priority number, date | US19870058215 | 04.06.1987 Original published format: US 58215 | [1988/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0293898 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0293898 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0293898 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | D02G1/20 | [1988/49] | CPC: |
D02G3/445 (EP,US);
D02G1/02 (KR);
D02G1/20 (EP,US);
D10B2503/04 (EP,US);
Y10S57/908 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, IT, NL [1993/48] |
Former [1988/49] | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Kühlen unter schwacher Spannung eines thermofixierten Zwirns | [1988/49] | English: | Low-tension quenching of ply twist/heatset yarn | [1988/49] | French: | Refroidissement sous tension faible d'un fil retors fixé à chaud | [1988/49] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 04.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0007563 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]); | [AD]US3968638 (NORTON LILBURN LAFAYETTE, et al); | [A]EP0026251 (MONSANTO CO [US]) |