EP0293943 - Benzoyl-ureas having insecticide activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.1992 [1992/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISTITUTO GUIDO DONEGANI S.p.A. Via Caduti del Lavoro I-28100 Novara / IT | [1988/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meazza, Giovanni, Dr. 30, via Pastore I-21047 Saronno Varese / IT | 02 /
Bettarini, Franco, Dr. 4/B via Cadore I-28100 Novara / IT | 03 /
Massardo, Pietro, Dr. 5, via Fra'Bartolomeo I-20123 Milan / IT | 04 /
Caprioli, Vincenzo, Dr. 8, via Loriga I-27028 San Martino Siccomario Pavia / IT | [1988/49] | Representative(s) | Zumstein jun., Fritz, et al Patentanwälte Dr. F. Zumstein Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | Zumstein, Fritz, Dr., et al Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88109005.4 | 06.06.1988 | [1988/49] | Priority number, date | IT19870020801 | 05.06.1987 Original published format: IT 2080187 | [1988/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0293943 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0293943 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07C127/22, A01N47/34 | [1988/49] | CPC: |
C07C275/54 (EP);
A01N47/34 (EP);
C07C323/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1988/49] | Title | German: | Benzoylharnstoffe mit insektizider Wirkung | [1988/49] | English: | Benzoyl-ureas having insecticide activity | [1988/49] | French: | Benzoylurées à activité insecticide | [1988/49] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 31.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/43] | 10.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/51] | 22.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0057888 (BASF AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0122449 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0203618 (DONEGANI GUIDO IST [IT]); | [Y]EP0161019 |