Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
21.03.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] |
20.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.01.1994 [1994/02] |
04.12.1992 | (Expected) grant | published on 20.01.1993 [1993/03] |
06.06.1990 | First examination report | |
28.04.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 14.06.1989 [1989/24] |
04.02.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.03.1989 [1989/12] |