EP0295561 - Silicone-polyimides, and method for making [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1988/51] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cella, James Anthony 95 Lace Lane Clifton Park New York 12065 / US | 02 /
Gallagher, Patrick Earl 56 Allengate Avenue Pittsfield Massachusetts 01201 / US | 03 /
Shank, Gary Keith Mohawk Terrace, Apartment 113 Clifton Park New York 12065 / US | [1988/51] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1992/27] | Pratt, Richard Wilson London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1988/51] | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 88109128.4 | 08.06.1988 | [1988/51] | Priority number, date | US19870063350 | 18.06.1987 Original published format: US 63350 | [1988/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0295561 | Date: | 21.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0295561 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/10, C08G77/42, H01B3/30 | [1988/51] | CPC: |
C08G73/106 (EP,US);
C08G77/455 (EP,US);
H01B3/306 (EP,US);
H01B3/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/51] | Title | German: | Silikon-Polyimide und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1988/51] | English: | Silicone-polyimides, and method for making | [1988/51] | French: | Silicone-polyimides et méthode de préparation | [1988/51] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 10.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/33] | 25.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4586997 (LEE CHUNG J [US]); | [AD]US3833546 (TAKEKOSHI T, et al); | [A]WO8700846 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]EP0156029 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) |