EP0345374 - Auxiliary sun visor for automobiles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.1991 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.09.1991 [1991/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aizawa, Genya 201 Hayashicho Mansion 30-2, Sendagi 5-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113 / JP | For all designated states Ono, Kakuhisa 10-45, Chiyogaoka 6-chome Aso-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 215 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | For all designated states Aizawa, Genya 201 Hayashicho Mansion 30-2, Sendagi 5-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113 / JP | ||
For all designated states Ono, Kakuhisa 10-45, Chiyogaoka 6-chome Aso-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 215 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/50] | Representative(s) | Kahler, Kurt Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | Kahler, Kurt, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener & Sturm P.O. Box 12 49 D-87712 Mindelheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 88109198.7 | 09.06.1988 | [1989/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0345374 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B60J3/02 | [1989/50] | CPC: |
B60J3/0208 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/50] | Title | German: | Hilfssonnenblende für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1989/50] | English: | Auxiliary sun visor for automobiles | [1989/50] | French: | Pare-soleil auxiliaire pour véhicules automobiles | [1989/50] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 29.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/50] | 16.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3410602 (WERNER SCHULER); | [A]US4317589 (KUSS JOHN D); | [A]US4526415 (JARDINE GEORGE W [US]) |