EP0296440 - Steam turbine for partial loading operation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.01.1994 [1994/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BBC Brown Boveri AG Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | [1988/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bütikofer, Jürg, Dr. Oberweg 235 CH-5015 Niedererlinsbach / CH | 02 /
Meyer, Hans Waldesruhstrasse 13 CH-5442 Fislisbach / CH | [1989/10] |
Former [1988/52] | 01 /
Bütikofer, Jürg, Dr. Oberweg 235 CH-5015 Niedererlinsbach / CH | ||
02 /
Meyer, Hans, Dr. Waldesruhstrasse 13 CH-5442 Fislisbach / CH | Application number, filing date | 88109355.3 | 13.06.1988 | [1988/52] | Priority number, date | CH19870002426 | 26.06.1987 Original published format: CH 242687 | [1988/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0296440 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0296440 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F01D1/16, F01D1/10 | [1988/52] | CPC: |
F01D1/16 (EP,US);
F01D1/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1988/52] | Title | German: | Dampfturbine für Teillastbetrieb | [1988/52] | English: | Steam turbine for partial loading operation | [1988/52] | French: | Turbine à vapeur pour des régimes de fonctionnement partiel | [1988/52] | Examination procedure | 01.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/31] | 19.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1991 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   01.08.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE713016 (AEG); | [X]DE694316 (AEG); | [A]DE520226 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US797064 (LINDMARK TORE GUSTAF EMANUEL [SE]); | [A]DE3006286 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) | [AD] - A. STODOLA: "Dampf- und Gasturbinen", 5. Auflage, 1922, Seiten 496-506, Verlag von Julius Springer, Berlin, DE | [AD] - W. TRAUPEL: "Thermische Turbomaschinen", 3. Auflage, 1977, Seiten 145-160, Springer Verlag, Berlin, DE |