blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0295633

EP0295633 - Optical fiber ribbon end-structure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.01.1994
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip06.01.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.02.1994 [1994/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD.
3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8350 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1988/51]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD.
3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-Ku
Tokyo 104 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Fujigaki, Takashi
5-2-B4-202, Kajihara
Kamakura-shi Kanagawa / JP
02 / Fujinaga, Yoshikazu
Mitsubishi Rayon S-syataku 4-1-3, Ushikawa Doori
Toyohashi-shi Aichi / JP
03 / Tokuda, Shuichiro
Mitsui Higashiyama Haitsu 102 2-28-1, Kiyosumi-cho
Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP
04 / Furukawa, Noriyuki
Kawai Bldg., 4-4-1, Shinpo-cho
Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP
05 / Ichimura, Kiyoshi
5-17-15, Kyodo
Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP
06 / Shibuya, Yukio
5-17-17, Kyodo
Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP
07 / Iuchi, Shigeru
5-17-15-301, Kyodo
Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP
[1988/51]
Representative(s)Grams, Klaus Dieter, et al
Patentanwaltsbüro
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/05]Grams, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
D-80336 München / DE
Former [1988/51]Grams, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne- Grupe-Pellmann-Grams-Struif-Winter-Roth Bavariaring 4
D-8000 München 2 / DE
Application number, filing date88109485.814.06.1988
[1988/51]
Priority number, dateJP19870093352U19.06.1987         Original published format: JP 9335287 U
[1988/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0295633
Date:21.12.1988
Language:EN
[1988/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0295633
Date:03.03.1993
Language:EN
[1993/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.1988
ClassificationIPC:G02B6/44, G02B6/04
[1988/51]
CPC:
G02B6/4439 (EP,US); G02B6/02 (KR); G02B6/4403 (EP,US);
G02B6/4471 (EP,KR,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [1988/51]
TitleGerman:Endstück faseroptischen Bandkabels[1988/51]
English:Optical fiber ribbon end-structure[1988/51]
French:Structure de terminaison de rubans de fibres optiques[1988/51]
File destroyed:20.04.2002
Examination procedure07.06.1989Examination requested  [1989/32]
09.08.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.08.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.10.1992Fee for grant paid
29.10.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.12.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1994/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3294504  (HICKS JR JOHN W);
 [A]US4188088  (ANDERSEN AXEL [DK], et al);
 [A]DE3526823  (SIEMENS AG [DE]);
 [AP]EP0236800  (KABELMETAL ELECTRO GMBH [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.