EP0295643 - Field effect transistor with short channel length and process of fabrication thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.1993 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.1993 [1993/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/51] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishijima, Toshiyuki c/o NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1988/51] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/51] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88109529.3 | 15.06.1988 | [1988/51] | Priority number, date | JP19870151837 | 17.06.1987 Original published format: JP 15183787 | [1988/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0295643 | Date: | 21.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0295643 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0295643 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/78, H01L21/00 | [1988/51] | CPC: |
H01L29/78 (EP,US);
H01L29/66651 (EP,US);
H01L29/66787 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1988/51] | Title | German: | Feldeffekttransistor mit kurzer Kanallänge und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1988/51] | English: | Field effect transistor with short channel length and process of fabrication thereof | [1988/51] | French: | Transistor à effet de champ à canal court et son procédé de fabrication | [1988/51] | Examination procedure | 15.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/51] | 29.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59175161 ; | [A]EP0077737 (FAIRCHILD CAMERA INSTR CO [US]); | [A]FR2561822 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 31 (E-295)[1754], 9th February 1985; & JP-A-59 175 161 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 03-10-1984, & JP59175161 A 00000000 |