EP0295679 - Physiologically-active novel peptides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.11.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1991 | Refusal of application | published on 02.01.1992 [1992/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIICHI PURE CHEMICALS CO. LTD. 13-5, Nihonbashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Matsuo, Hisayuki 6653 Ooaza-Kihara Kiyotake-cho Miyazaki-gun Miyazaki 889-16 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/09] | For all designated states DAIICHI PURE CHEMICALS CO. LTD. 13-5, Nihonbashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Matsuo, Hisayuki 6653 Ooaza-Kihara Kiyotake-cho Miyazaki-gun Miyazaki 889-16 / JP | |||
Former [1988/51] | For all designated states DAIICHI PURE CHEMICALS CO. LTD. 13-5, Nihonbashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Matsuo, Hisayuki 5-15-141 Onoharahigashi 5-chome Minoo-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuo, Hisayuki 6653, Oaza Kihara Kyotake-cho Miyazaki-gun Miyazaki-ken / JP | 02 /
Kangawa, Kenji 1520-24, Koaza Kushima Oaza Kanoh Kiyotake-cho Miyazaki-gun Miyazaki-ken / JP | 03 /
Minamino, Naoto 5618, Oaza KiharaKiyotake-cho Miyazaki-gun Miyazaki-ken / JP | 04 /
Sudoh, Tesuji Daiichi Pure Chemicals co., Ltd 5-5-12, Narihira Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Izumi, Atsushi Daiichi Pure Chemicals co., Ltd 5-5-12, Narihira Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Isogai, Mitsutaka Daiichi Pure Chemicals co., Ltd 5-5-12, Narihira Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | [1988/51] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/51] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88109650.7 | 16.06.1988 | [1988/51] | Priority number, date | JP19870150853 | 17.06.1987 Original published format: JP 15085387 | [1988/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0295679 | Date: | 21.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0295679 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/10, A61K37/24 | [1990/17] | CPC: |
C07K14/58 (EP,US);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/51] | C07K7/00, A61K37/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/51] | Title | German: | Physiologisch aktive Peptide | [1988/51] | English: | Physiologically-active novel peptides | [1988/51] | French: | Peptides physiologiquement actifs | [1988/51] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 09.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/49] | 19.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1992/01] | 12.08.1991 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1992/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8504870 (BIOTECH RES PARTNERS LTD [US]) | [XP] - NATURE, vol. 332, 3rd March 1988, pages 78-81; T. SUDOH et al.: "A new natriuretic peptide in porcine brain" |