EP0295708 - Semiconductor device having a superconductive wiring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 13.09.1995 [1995/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/51] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taguchi, Masao 3-4-201, Araisono 4-chome Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa, 228 / JP | [1988/51] | Representative(s) | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/51] | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner Postfach 33 06 09 D-80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88109700.0 | 16.06.1988 | [1988/51] | Priority number, date | JP19870150248 | 18.06.1987 Original published format: JP 15024887 | [1988/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0295708 | Date: | 21.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0295708 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0295708 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/52, H01L21/90, H01L39/24 | [1989/34] | CPC: |
H01L23/53285 (EP,KR,US);
H01L23/532 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/51] | H01L23/52 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/51] | Title | German: | Halbleiteranordnung mit einer supraleitenden Metallisierung | [1988/51] | English: | Semiconductor device having a superconductive wiring | [1988/51] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur comprenant une métallisation supraconductrice | [1988/51] | Examination procedure | 05.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/18] | 30.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 23.02.1994 | GB | 16.06.1994 | [1995/37] |
Former [1994/45] | DE | 23.02.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61201467 ; | [A]JP60154613 ; | [A]JP61164271 ; | [E]EP0299163 (SHARP KK [JP]) | Examination | EP0303521 | EP0336505 |