EP0297374 - Car radio [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1994 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.1994 [1994/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blaupunkt-Werke GmbH Postfach 77 77 77 31132 Hildesheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/01] | For all designated states Blaupunkt-Werke GmbH Postfach 77 77 77 D-31132 Hildesheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brägas, Peter Hausbergring 49 D-3200 Hildesheim / DE | 02 /
Duckeck, Hans Trockener Kamp 23 D-3200 Hildesheim / DE | [1989/01] | Representative(s) | Eilers, Norbert Blaupunkt-Werke GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 77 77 77 31132 Hildesheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/01] | Eilers, Norbert, Dipl.-Phys. Blaupunkt-Werke GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 77 77 77 D-31132 Hildesheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 88109753.9 | 18.06.1988 | [1989/01] | Priority number, date | DE19873721727 | 01.07.1987 Original published format: DE 3721727 | [1989/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0297374 | Date: | 04.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0297374 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0297374 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/09 | [1989/01] | CPC: |
G08G1/094 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1989/01] | Title | German: | Autoradio | [1989/01] | English: | Car radio | [1989/01] | French: | Radio pour voiture | [1989/01] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/29] | 11.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - FUNKSCHAU, Band 58, Nr. 1, Januar 1986, Seiten 43-47; H. DERNEDDE-JESSEN et al.: "RDS: Neue Entwicklung auf Hörfunkwellen" | [Y] - ELEKTOR, Band 4, Nr. 6, Juni 1978, Seiten 6-34 - 6-35: "Automatic mono stereo switch" |