EP0296517 - Process for preparing monohalogenated benzocyclobutene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/52] | Process for preparing monohalogenated cyclobutarenes | ||
[1993/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Dow Chemical Company 2020 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/52] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liu, Ming-Biann 386 Mt. Sequoia Place Clayton California 94517 / US | [1988/52] | Representative(s) | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, et al Patentanwälte Sternagel & Fleischer Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/52] | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Michael Hann Dr. H.-G. Sternagel Sander Aue 30 D-51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 88109765.3 | 18.06.1988 | [1988/52] | Priority number, date | US19870064714 | 22.06.1987 Original published format: US 64714 | [1988/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0296517 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0296517 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0296517 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C25/18, C07C17/12 | [1988/52] | CPC: |
C07C17/12 (EP,US);
C07C25/22 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/12, C07C25/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von monohalogeniertem Benzocyclobuten | [1993/30] | English: | Process for preparing monohalogenated benzocyclobutene | [1993/30] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de benzocyclobutène monohalogené | [1993/30] |
Former [1988/52] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von monobromierten Cyclobutarenen | ||
Former [1988/52] | Process for preparing monohalogenated cyclobutarenes | ||
Former [1988/52] | Procédé pour la fabrication de cyclo-butarènes monobrominés | Examination procedure | 09.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/23] | 06.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.07.1993 | ES | 28.07.1993 | [2002/24] |
Former [1994/19] | AT | 28.07.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US4540763 (KIRCHHOFF ROBERT A [US]); | [X]WO8701383 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) | [XD] - TETRAHEDRON | [X] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY | [ ] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY | Examination | - TETRAHEDRON, vol. 21, 1965, pages 245-254, London, GB; J. B. F. LLOYD et al, "The electrophilic substitution of benzocyclobutene-II" | - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 80, no. 9, 9 May 1958, pages 2255-2257, Columbus, Ohio, USA; M. P. CAVA et al, "Condensed cyclobutane aromatic systems. IV. Benzocyclobutene and 1-bromobenzocyclobutene" | - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 99, no. 12, 8 June 1977, pages 4058-4069, Columbus, Ohio, USA; R. L. HILLARD III et al, "Substituted benzocyclobutenes, indans and tetralins via cobalt-catalyzed cooligomerization of alpha,omega-diynes with substituted acetylenes. Formation and synthetic utility of trimethylsilylated benzocycloalkenes" |