EP0296570 - Low pressure, high efficiency carbonator and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.1993 [1993/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AQUATEC, INC. 850 Moraga Drive Los Angeles, CA 90049 / US | [1988/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hancock, Mark W 850 Moraga Drive Los Angeles California 90049 / US | 02 /
May, Marvin M 529 South Westgate Los Angeles California 90049 / US | [1988/52] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1992/42] |
Former [1992/23] | Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/52] | Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 W-8000 München 40 / DE | Application number, filing date | 88109949.3 | 22.06.1988 | [1988/52] | Priority number, date | US19870068018 | 26.06.1987 Original published format: US 68018 | US19870068017 | 26.06.1987 Original published format: US 68017 | US19870067803 | 26.06.1987 Original published format: US 67803 | [1988/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0296570 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A23L2/26, B01F3/04 | [1988/52] | CPC: |
B67D1/0071 (EP);
B01F23/2312 (EP,US);
B01F23/234 (EP);
B01F23/23413 (EP);
B01F23/2362 (EP);
B01F23/2363 (EP);
B01F23/2368 (EP);
B01F23/23762 (EP);
B01F25/20 (EP);
B01F25/21 (EP);
B01F25/25 (EP);
B01F33/82 (EP);
B01F35/2112 (EP);
B67D1/0009 (EP);
B67D1/0057 (EP);
B67D1/0067 (EP);
B67D1/0068 (EP);
B67D2001/0814 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/52] | Title | German: | Hoch effizienter Niederdruck-Karbonator und Verfahren | [1988/52] | English: | Low pressure, high efficiency carbonator and method | [1988/52] | French: | Carbonateur à basse pression et à rendement élevé et méthode | [1988/52] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/34] | 21.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/23] | 19.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1991 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.12.1991 | 30.06.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3552726 (KRAFT ELROY J); | [A]DE2340249 (IANNELLI FRANK M); | [A]DE2647597 (CONS FOODS CORP); | [A]WO8400671 (SODASTREAM LTD [GB]) |