EP0299248 - Processing apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.08.1993 [1993/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/03] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Loewenstein, Lee M. 1809 Cortez Drive Plano Texas 75074 / US | 02 /
Davis, Cecil J. Route 4, Box 113C Greenville Texas 75401 / US | [1989/03] | Representative(s) | Leiser, Gottfried, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/03] | Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing., et al Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88110011.9 | 23.06.1988 | [1989/03] | Priority number, date | US19870074379 | 16.07.1987 Original published format: US 74379 | [1989/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0299248 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0299248 | Date: | 19.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/31, C23C16/50 | [1989/03] | CPC: |
C23C16/517 (EP);
H01L21/00 (KR);
H01L21/31 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/03] | Title | German: | Behandlungsapparat und -verfahren | [1989/03] | English: | Processing apparatus and method | [1989/03] | French: | Dispositif et méthode de traitement | [1989/03] | Examination procedure | 17.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/37] | 16.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/32] | Request for further processing for: | 01.08.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 01.08.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.10.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4473437 (HIGASHIKAWA IWAO [JP], et al); | [A]US4544416 (MEADOR CHARLES G [US], et al); | [A]EP0202907 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]); | [A]WO8100862 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO [US]) | [A] - MICROELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, vol. 4, no. 3, 1986, pages 207-219, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V. (North-Holland), Amsterdam, NL; M. DESCHLER et al.: "Optimization of via hole plasma etching in polyimide for overlay interconnections" | [A] - ELECTRONICS, vol. 58, no. 43, 28th October 1985, page 64, New York, US; "A dry photoresist stripper that won't damage the wafer" | [A] - EXTENDED ABSTRACTS, vol. 86-1, no. 1, May 1986, pages 393-394, abstract no. 268, Pennington, New Jersey, US; H.-R. CHANG et al.: "Reactive ion etching of photoresist and polysilicon for planarization" |