EP0319644 - Alkylated amide derivatives, their use and pharmaceutical compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.05.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 07.07.1993 [1993/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Green Cross Corporation 3-3, Imabashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/21] | For all designated states THE GREEN CROSS CORPORATION 3-3, Imabashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | ||
Former [1989/24] | For all designated states GREEN CROSS CORPORATION 15-1, Imabashi 1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwai, Masakazu Forumu Momogaike Koen 203 1-12-18, Mimogaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
Kohda, Isao 7-15-1-405, Minami Mukonoso Amagasaki-shi Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Fukaya, Chikara 2-11-33-604, Kema-cho Miyokojima-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | 04 /
Arakawa, Yoshio 7-81, Aoyama Nara-shi Nara / JP | [1989/24] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/24] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88110388.1 | 29.06.1988 | [1989/24] | Priority number, date | JP19870282747 | 09.11.1987 Original published format: JP 28274787 | [1989/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0319644 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0319644 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07C149/24, C07D211/20, C07C147/14, A61K31/16, A61K31/445 | [1989/24] | CPC: |
C07C323/41 (EP,KR);
A61K31/18 (KR);
A61K31/445 (KR);
C07D211/20 (EP,KR);
C07C2601/14 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/24] | Title | German: | Alkylierte Amid-Derivate, deren Verwendung und diese enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen | [1989/24] | English: | Alkylated amide derivatives, their use and pharmaceutical compositions containing them | [1989/24] | French: | Dérivés alcoylés d'amides, leur utilisation et compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant | [1989/24] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 10.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/40] | 08.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.02.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/27] | 18.02.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1445716 [ ] (BAYER AG); | DE1904149 [ ] (EASTMAN KODAK CO); | US3786089 [ ] (RONDESTVEDT C); | EP0195433 [ ] (GREEN CROSS CORP [JP]) |