EP0314874 - Method for delivering a foamable mixture, especially a temperature insulation material, using a mixing head for at least two reactive components in a low-pressure method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.1993 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prignitz, Herbert Papyrusweg 12 22117 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | For all designated states Prignitz, Herbert Papyrusweg 12 D-22117 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/19] | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Richter, Werdermann, Gerbaulet & Hofmann Patentanwälte Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1989/19] | Richter, Werdermann & Gerbaulet Neuer Wall 10 D-20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 88110528.2 | 01.07.1988 | [1989/19] | Priority number, date | EP19870116268 | 05.11.1987 Original published format: EP 87116268 | DE19880006267U | 11.05.1988 Original published format: DE 8806267 U | [1989/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0314874 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0314874 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0314874 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B29B7/40, E04D5/10, E04D3/35 | [1989/24] | CPC: |
B29B7/407 (EP);
E04D13/1693 (EP);
E04D13/172 (EP);
E04D3/352 (EP);
E04D3/358 (EP);
E04D5/10 (EP);
E04D5/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1989/19] | B29B7/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Austragen eines Schaumstoffgemisches, insbesondere für ein Wärmedämmaterial, vermittels eines Mischkopfes für mindestens zwei reaktive Komponenten im Niederdruckverfahren | [1989/19] | English: | Method for delivering a foamable mixture, especially a temperature insulation material, using a mixing head for at least two reactive components in a low-pressure method | [1989/19] | French: | Procédé de distribution d'un mélange d'un matériau mousseux, en particulier d'un matériau d'isolation de chaleur, au moyen d'une tête de mélange pour au moins deux composants réactifs dans un procédé sous pression basse | [1989/19] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 07.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 16.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3111389 [ ]; | US3092469 [ ]; | DE2322716 [ ]; | FR2310376 [ ]; | DE1457182 [ ]; | US3081487 [ ]; | GB2140314 [ ]; | US3572646 [ ]; | LU38091 [ ]; | [A]DE2725937 ; | [A]GB1103551 ; | [A]US3455076 ; | [A]DE3300755 ; | [A]DE2519484 ; | [A]US3979245 ; | [A]DE8514452U ; | [A]DE8604889U ; | [A]DE8519811U |