EP0297622 - Pick-up apparatus for self-propelled machine for loading and cleaning beets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Holmer, Alfons Regensburger Strasse 20 84069 Eggmühl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/01] | For all designated states Holmer, Alfons Regensburger Strasse 20 D-84069 Schierling / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/01] | Representative(s) | Wasmeier, Alfons, et al Patentanwälte Graf Wasmeier Glück Postfach 10 08 26 93008 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | Wasmeier, Alfons, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Wasmeier & Graf Postfach 10 08 26 D-93008 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [1989/01] | Wasmeier, Alfons, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Wasmeier & Graf Postfach 10 08 26 D-8400 Regensburg 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 88110653.8 | 04.07.1988 | [1989/01] | Priority number, date | DE19873721998 | 03.07.1987 Original published format: DE 3721998 | [1989/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0297622 | Date: | 04.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0297622 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A01D51/00, A01D33/10 | [1989/01] | CPC: |
A01D33/10 (EP);
A01D51/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/01] | Title | German: | Fördereinrichtung für selbstfahrendes Rübenlade-und Reinigungsgerät | [1989/01] | English: | Pick-up apparatus for self-propelled machine for loading and cleaning beets | [1989/01] | French: | Dispositif de ramassage pour appareil automoteur pour le chargement et le nettoyage de betteraves | [1989/01] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/35] | 23.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 17.06.1992 | GB | 17.06.1992 | GR | 17.06.1992 | SE | 17.06.1992 | AT | 04.07.1992 | CH | 31.07.1992 | LI | 31.07.1992 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | GB | 17.06.1992 | |
GR | 17.06.1992 | ||
SE | 17.06.1992 | ||
AT | 04.07.1992 | ||
CH | 31.07.1992 | ||
LI | 31.07.1992 | ||
Former [1994/25] | GB | 17.06.1992 | |
SE | 17.06.1992 | ||
AT | 04.07.1992 | ||
CH | 31.07.1992 | ||
LI | 31.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/46] | GB | 17.06.1992 | |
SE | 17.06.1992 | ||
CH | 31.07.1992 | ||
LI | 31.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/23] | SE | 17.06.1992 | |
CH | 31.07.1992 | ||
LI | 31.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/03] | SE | 17.06.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1345754 (REMY & FILS); | [A]FR1350138 ; | [A]FR86825E ; | [Y]US3961469 (MCROBERT LEON R); | [Y]FR2417246 (FIVES CAIL BABCOCK [FR]); | [Y]US4706447 (WATMOUGH ROBERT R [CA], et al) | Examination | DE3217889 |