EP0298442 - A pump and a method of separating gas by such from a fluid to be pumped [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A. AHLSTROM CORPORATION 29600 Noormarkku / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states A. AHLSTROM CORPORATION FIN-29600 Noormarkku / FI | ||
Former [1989/39] | For all designated states A. AHLSTROM CORPORATION SF-29600 Karhula / FI | ||
Former [1989/02] | For all designated states A. AHLSTROM CORPORATION FIN-29600 Noormarkku / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niskanen, Toivo Maariankatu 10B 18 SF-49400 Hamina / FI | [1989/02] | Representative(s) | Füchsle, Klaus, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | Füchsle, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88110778.3 | 06.07.1988 | [1989/02] | Priority number, date | FI19870002967 | 06.07.1987 Original published format: FI 872967 | [1989/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0298442 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0298442 | Date: | 05.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0298442 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F04D9/00, F04D29/70 | [1989/02] | CPC: |
F04D29/708 (EP,US);
F04D9/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/02] | Title | German: | Pumpe und Verfahren zur Abscheidung von Gas aus einem zu fördernde Fluidum | [1989/02] | English: | A pump and a method of separating gas by such from a fluid to be pumped | [1989/02] | French: | Pompe et procédé de séparation de gaz du fluide à pomper | [1989/02] | Examination procedure | 06.07.1988 | Examination requested [1989/02] | 07.06.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 13.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 29.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 01.04.1992 | GR | 01.04.1992 | IT | 01.04.1992 | NL | 01.04.1992 | GB | 06.07.1992 | CH | 31.07.1992 | LI | 31.07.1992 | LU | 31.07.1992 | [2007/52] |
Former [2000/04] | BE | 01.04.1992 | |
GR | 01.04.1992 | ||
IT | 01.04.1992 | ||
NL | 01.04.1992 | ||
GB | 06.07.1992 | ||
CH | 31.07.1992 | ||
LI | 31.07.1992 | ||
LU | 31.07.1992 | ||
Former [1999/52] | BE | 01.04.1992 | |
IT | 01.04.1992 | ||
NL | 01.04.1992 | ||
GB | 06.07.1992 | ||
CH | 31.07.1992 | ||
LI | 31.07.1992 | ||
LU | 31.07.1992 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 01.04.1992 | |
IT | 01.04.1992 | ||
NL | 01.04.1992 | ||
GB | 06.07.1992 | ||
CH | 31.07.1992 | ||
LI | 31.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/47] | BE | 01.04.1992 | |
NL | 01.04.1992 | ||
GB | 06.07.1992 | ||
CH | 31.07.1992 | ||
LI | 31.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/23] | BE | 01.04.1992 | |
NL | 01.04.1992 | ||
CH | 31.07.1992 | ||
LI | 31.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/01] | BE | 01.04.1992 | |
NL | 01.04.1992 | ||
Former [1992/48] | NL | 01.04.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]NL80028C ; | [X]FR456863 (CIE GENERALE D ELECTRICITE DE [FR]); | [X]US1345895 (LAURENT SEGUIN); | [A]DE858357 (EISELE SOEHNE FRANZ); | [X]DE862563 (EISELE SOEHNE FRANZ); | [X]DE864953 (EISELE SOEHNE FRANZ); | [X]DE1023671 (JOSEF EISELE); | [X]US3435771 (RIPLE JAMES C); | [A]DE2312022 (GOESTA LARSSONS MEK VERKSTAD A); | [A]US3944406 (JAGUSCH LEONHARD, et al); | [X]US4194893 (RUSSELL WALTER W [GB], et al) |