EP0299393 - Optical lens or lens system with variable servo control focusing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.1994 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.1994 [1994/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Barnea, Daniel I., Dr. 1 Ugarit Street IL-69016 Tel Aviv / IL | [1989/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/03] | Representative(s) | Beckensträter, Friedrich Wilhelm Falkensteiner Strasse 23 60322 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/27] | Beckensträter, Friedrich Wilhelm, Dr. Falkensteiner Strasse 23 D-60322 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1989/03] | DELETED Beckensträter, Friedrich Wilhelm (DE) deceased in 1994 Falkensteiner Strasse 23 D-60322 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 88111007.6 | 09.07.1988 | [1989/03] | Priority number, date | IL19790000831 | 14.07.1987 Original published format: IL 83179 | IL19790000831 | 03.03.1988 Original published format: IL 83179 | [1989/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0299393 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0299393 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G02B3/14, G02B26/08 | [1989/37] | CPC: |
G02B3/14 (EP,US);
G02C7/085 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/03] | G02B3/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL [1989/13] |
Former [1989/03] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Optische Linse oder optisches Linsensystem mit variable Servo-Fokussierung | [1989/03] | English: | Optical lens or lens system with variable servo control focusing | [1989/03] | French: | Lentille optique ou système de lentilles avec focalisation variable à servocommande | [1989/03] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 10.08.1988 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) ES, GR, IT, SE | 01.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/18] | 06.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 09.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/30] | 03.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.08.1988 | ES   M02   Not yet paid | 09.08.1988 | GR   M02   Not yet paid | 09.08.1988 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 09.08.1988 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1993 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH241033 (DESSAUER FRIEDRICH PROF DR [CH]); | [X]DE936299 (KLUMPP AUGUST); | [X]FR1602997 ; | [A]DE3221690 (GERBER SCIENT INC [US]); | [A]GB2183059 (TREISMAN MICHEL, et al) |