EP0300339 - Holder for containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.1991 [1991/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GERMANISCHER LLOYD Vorsetzen 32 D-2000 Hamburg 11 / DE | [1989/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schümann, Ulrich Lutzhorner Landstrasse 35 D-2202 Barmstedt / DE | [1989/04] | Representative(s) | Heldt, Gert Rechtsanwalt - Patentanwalt Holstenwall 10 20355 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/04] | Heldt, Gert, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Neuer Wall 59 III D-20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 88111176.9 | 13.07.1988 | [1989/04] | Priority number, date | DE19873724015 | 21.07.1987 Original published format: DE 3724015 | [1989/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0300339 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0300339 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B63B25/22 | [1989/04] | CPC: |
B63B25/28 (EP);
B65D90/0006 (EP);
B65G67/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/04] | Title | German: | Containerhalterung | [1989/04] | English: | Holder for containers | [1989/04] | French: | Support pour récipients | [1989/04] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 22.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/38] | 06.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/51] | 19.07.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.10.1990 | 31.07.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3680518 (TABUCHI ICHIRO, et al); | [X]DE1930133 (AMERICAN EXP ISBRANDTSEN LINES); | [A]DE3201741 (CONVER ING TECHNIK GMBH [DE]) |