EP0299449 - Pyridazinone, triazinone and oxapyridazinone lipoxygenase inhibiting compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.1995 | Change - applicant | published on 09.08.1995 [1995/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES One Abbott Park Road Abbott Park IL 60064-3500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES One Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US | ||
Former [1989/03] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES Abbott Park, Illinois 60064 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brooks, Dee W. 1127 Kristin Drive Libertyville Illinois 60048 / US | 02 /
Carter, George W. 1734 Buckingham Road Mundelein Illinois 60060 / US | 03 /
Basha, Anwer 41 Heron Road Lake Forest Illinois 60045 / US | 04 /
Dyer, Richard D. 3436 Gettysburg Ann Arbor Michigan 48105 / US | 05 /
Gunn, Bruce P. 849 Lexington Lane Island Lake Illinois 60042 / US | 06 /
Bhatia, Pramila A. 193 Knights Bridge Drive Mundelein Illinois 60060 / US | [1989/03] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano Gardi Patents, Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/03] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Baaderstrasse 3 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88111206.4 | 13.07.1988 | [1989/03] | Priority number, date | US19870075015 | 17.07.1987 Original published format: US 75015 | US19880210806 | 28.06.1988 Original published format: US 210806 | [1989/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0299449 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0299449 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D237/04, C07D253/06, C07D273/04, C07D401/04, C07D403/04, C07D405/04, C07D413/04, C07D417/04, A61K31/535, A61K31/53, A61K31/50 | [1991/10] | CPC: |
C07D253/06 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D237/04 (EP,US);
C07D273/04 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1991/09] | C07D237/04, C07D253/06, C07D273/04, C07D401/04, C07D403/04, C07D405/04, C07D413/04, C07D417/04, A61K31/53, A61K31/50 | ||
Former IPC [1989/03] | C07D273/04, C07D253/06, C07D237/04, A61K31/535, A61K31/53, A61K31/50 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/03] | Title | German: | Als Lipoxygenase-Inhibitoren wirkende Pyridazinon-, Triazinon- und Oxapyridazinon-Verbindungen | [1989/03] | English: | Pyridazinone, triazinone and oxapyridazinone lipoxygenase inhibiting compounds | [1989/03] | French: | Composés de pyridazinone, triazinone et oxapyridazinone comme inhibiteurs de lypoxygénase | [1989/03] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 20.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/47] | 02.02.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/31] | 04.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1991 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.1991 | 31.07.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 108, no. 11, 14 March 1988 Columbus, Ohio, USA H.A. DOWLATSHAHI: "1,4,5,6-Tetrahydro-1-phenylpy ridazin-3(2H)-one, a homolog of phenidone" & Synth.Commun. 1987, 17(10), 1253-9 | [AP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 108, no. 15, 11 April 1988 Columbus, Ohio, USA A.V. BLOKHINA et al.: "Synthesis of N-arylamino-2-pyrrolidones from Ó-chlorobutyric acid arylhydrazides" & Khim. Geterotsikl. Soedin. 1987, (4), 474-8 (cat. A) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 75, no. 11, 13 September 1971 Columbus, Ohio, USA G. PALAZZO et al.: "Reaction of N-chlorocarbonyl-N-(2-chloroethyl)aniline with hydrazine and monosubstituted hydrazines" & Farmaco, Ed. Sci. 1971, 26(6), 580-90 | [AD] - COLLECTION OF CZECHOSLOVAK CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, vol. 33, no. 7, 1968, pages 2087 - 2096; J. GUT et al.: "Reaction of six-membered cyclic hydrazides with aromatic aldehydes" | [AD] - FEDERATION OF AMERICAN SOCIETIES FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY 69TH ANNUAL MEETING, 1985, page 1185 P.R. YOUNG et al.: "A comparison of the in-vivo and in-vitro effects of selected 5-lipoxygenase (5-LP) inhibitors" |