EP0299500 - Light-reflective slide fastener [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.1994 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K. No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/03] | For all designated states YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K. No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Takashi 577-9, Oka Kurobe-shi Toyama-ken / JP | 02 /
Kumano, Isamu 1287, Mikkaichi Kurobe-shi Toyama-ken / JP | [1989/03] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/03] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88111366.6 | 14.07.1988 | [1989/03] | Priority number, date | JP19870176898 | 14.07.1987 Original published format: JP 17689887 | [1989/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0299500 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0299500 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A44B19/34 | [1989/03] | CPC: |
A44B19/34 (EP,US);
A44B19/22 (KR);
Y10T24/25 (EP,US);
Y10T24/2514 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/03] | Title | German: | Lichtreflektierender Reissverschluss | [1989/03] | English: | Light-reflective slide fastener | [1989/03] | French: | Fermeture à glissière réflèchissant la lumière | [1989/03] | Examination procedure | 26.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/27] | 22.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2335124 (PRESTIL [FR]); | [Y]US3255504 (HANS POREPP); | [A]US2236033 (OGDEN KILLMER); | [A]GB899967 (RUHRMANN JOSEF); | [A]US2495033 (SULLIVAN JOSEPH F) |