Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0303067
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
23.11.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] |
03.09.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
14.04.1995 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.06.1995 [1995/23] |
03.02.1995 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] |
29.11.1994 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.1995 [1995/03] |
29.04.1994 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.06.1994 [1994/24] |
17.09.1992 |
First examination report |
|
26.09.1990 |
Publication of search report |
published on 14.11.1990 [1990/46] |
31.12.1988 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.02.1989 [1989/07] |
31.12.1988 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.02.1989 [1989/07] |