Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2785940B | 13.08.1998 | B2 | JPH01105649 | 24.04.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | JP17828587 | 16.07.1987 | JP17664188 | 14.07.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU614089B | Global Dossier | 22.08.1991 | B2 | AU1917388 | 19.01.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | JP17828587 | 16.07.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0303067 | Global Dossier | 15.06.1994 | B1 | EP0303067 | 14.11.1990 | A3 | EP0303067 | 15.02.1989 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP17828587 | 16.07.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1292336 | 19.11.1991 | C | Priority number | Date | JP17828587 | 16.07.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3850184D1 | 21.07.1994 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP17828587 | 16.07.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR910010009B | 10.12.1991 | B1 | KR890003171 | 13.04.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | JP17828587 | 16.07.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4939770 | 03.07.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | JP17828587 | 16.07.1987 |