Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP0299529


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.02.1992 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  15.04.1992 [1992/16]
12.03.1991 First examination report
16.05.1990 Request for examination filed published on  04.07.1990 [1990/27]
22.09.1989 Publication of search report published on  08.11.1989 [1989/45]
24.01.1989 Change - applicant published on  15.03.1989 [1989/11]
03.12.1988 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  18.01.1989 [1989/03]