blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0299529

EP0299529 - Mill, especially an agitator mill [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.02.1992
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.1992Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.04.1992 [1992/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Erich Netzsch GmbH & Co. Holding KG
Gebrüder-Netzsch-Strasse 19
D-95100 Selb / DE
[1989/11]
Former [1989/03]For all designated states
ERICH NETZSCH GMBH & CO HOLDING KG
Gebrüder-Netzsch-Strasse 19
D-8672 Selb / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Klimaschka, Norbert
Lärchenweg 5
D-8672 Selb / DE
02 / Schmidt, Wolfgang
Alexander von Humboldt-Strasse 13
D-8672 Selb / DE
03 / Enderle, Udo
Albert-Schweitzer-Strasse 2
D-8590 Marktredwitz / DE
[1989/03]
Representative(s)Goetz, Rupert, et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/03]Goetz, Rupert, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date88111435.915.07.1988
[1989/03]
Priority number, dateDE1987372355816.07.1987         Original published format: DE 3723558
[1989/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0299529
Date:18.01.1989
Language:DE
[1989/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0299529
Date:08.11.1989
Language:DE
[1989/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.1989
ClassificationIPC:B02C17/16
[1989/03]
CPC:
B02C17/16 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1989/03]
TitleGerman:Mühle, insbesondere Rührwerksmühle[1989/03]
English:Mill, especially an agitator mill[1989/03]
French:Broyeur, en particulier broyeur à agitateur[1989/03]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure08.05.1990Examination requested  [1990/27]
18.03.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.09.1991Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1992/16]
08.11.1991Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1992/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.07.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.199104   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE2931868  (ANNAWERK GMBH [DE]);
 [Y]WO8604526  (SLEGTEN SA [BE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.