EP0299530 - Support for inclusion into identity cards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 04.10.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH Postfach 70 07 03 81307 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/03] | For all designated states GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH Postfach 70 07 03 D-81307 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haghiri-Tehrani, Yahya, Dipl.-Ing. Winzererstrasse 98 D-8000 München 40 / DE | 02 /
Barak, Renée-Lucia, Dipl.-Ing. Säulenstrasse 2 D-8025 Unterhaching / DE | [1989/03] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/03] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88111437.5 | 15.07.1988 | [1989/03] | Priority number, date | DE19873723547 | 16.07.1987 Original published format: DE 3723547 | [1989/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0299530 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0299530 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/06 | [1989/03] | CPC: |
G06K19/07747 (EP,US);
G06K19/07745 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48228 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01004 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/03] | Title | German: | Trägerelement zum Einbau in Ausweiskarten | [1989/03] | English: | Support for inclusion into identity cards | [1989/03] | French: | Support pour la fabrication de cartes d'identification | [1989/03] | Examination procedure | 19.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/33] | 10.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.1992
08.01.1993
ADMISSIBLE Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL Opponent's representative Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria, et al, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/39] |
Former [1993/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.1992
08.01.1993
ADMISSIBLE Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL Opponent's representative Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria, et al, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1993/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.1992
GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH Euckenstrasse 12 D-81369 München / DE Opponent's representative Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria, et al, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 08.02.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.06.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 20.02.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.06.1995 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.06.1995 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 08.07.1995 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2337381 (HONEYWELL BULL SOC IND [FR]); | [A]FR2520541 (FLONIC SA [FR]); | [AD]EP0107061 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al); | [Y]FR2548857 (CORTAILLOD CABLES SA [CH]); | [YD]EP0201952 |