blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0306672

EP0306672 - Method and apparatus for helically coiling metal strip on tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.1992
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.1992No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.10.1992 [1992/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Balcke-Dürr AG
Homberger Strasse 2
D-40882 Ratingen / DE
[1989/11]
Inventor(s)01 / Joekel, Alfred
Ruhrtalstrasse 113
D-4300 Essen 16 / DE
02 / Denner, Peter
Beerenkothen 26
D-4030 Ratingen 1 / DE
03 / Herrmann, Wolfgang
Dechenstrasse 4
D-4030 Ratingen 1 / DE
[1989/11]
Representative(s)Brinkmann & Partner
Patentanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Am Seestern 8
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/11]Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte
Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70
D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date88111656.020.07.1988
[1989/11]
Priority number, dateDE1987372985905.09.1987         Original published format: DE 3729859
[1989/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0306672
Date:15.03.1989
Language:DE
[1989/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0306672
Date:08.11.1989
Language:DE
[1989/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0306672
Date:23.10.1991
Language:DE
[1991/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.1989
ClassificationIPC:B21C37/26
[1989/11]
CPC:
B21C37/26 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/11]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum wendelförmigen Aufwickeln von Metallband auf Rohre[1989/11]
English:Method and apparatus for helically coiling metal strip on tubes[1989/11]
French:Procédé et appareil pour l'enroulement en hélice d'un ruban métallique sur des tubes[1989/11]
Examination procedure07.10.1989Examination requested  [1989/49]
04.12.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.02.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.04.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.06.1991Fee for grant paid
18.06.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.07.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1992/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE2436768  ;
 [A]DE556390  (BOESDORFER MASCHINENFABRIK & E);
 [AD]DE2313436  ;
 [AD]DE3320235  (BALCKE DUERR AG);
 [AD]DE3131473
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.