EP0314881 - Device for sorting piece goods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1991 [1991/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L. & C. Arnold Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 11 60 W-7060 Schorndorf / DE | [1991/12] |
Former [1989/19] | For all designated states L. & C. ARNOLD GMBH Karlstrasse 24 D-7060 Schorndorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlabbers, Günther Utrechterstrasse 22 D-4170 Geldern 1 / DE | [1989/19] | Representative(s) | Beyer, Rudi Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Rudi Beyer Am Dickelsbach 8 40883 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | Beyer, Rudi Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Rudi Beyer Am Dickelsbach 8 D-40883 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 88111897.0 | 23.07.1988 | [1989/19] | Priority number, date | DE19873737543 | 05.11.1987 Original published format: DE 3737543 | [1989/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0314881 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0314881 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/53, B65G47/82 | [1989/19] | CPC: |
B65G47/82 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/19] | Title | German: | Aussortiervorrichtung für Stückgüter | [1989/19] | English: | Device for sorting piece goods | [1989/19] | French: | Dispositif de triage pour marchandises | [1989/19] | Examination procedure | 02.08.1988 | Examination requested [1989/19] | 10.03.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 27.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 05.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4298117 [ ] (KOBAYASHI TAKUO, et al) | Examination | US3006457 |