EP0302339 - Sealable sandwich film with improved transparency [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 25.07.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wolff Walsrode Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 15 15 D-29655 Walsrode / DE | [1989/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schinkel, Ingo, Dipl.-Ing. Witternstrasse 14 D-3030 Walsrode 1 / DE | 02 /
Böhner, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Am Haselbusch 3 D-3036 Bomlitz / DE | [1989/06] | Representative(s) | Zobel, Manfred, et al LANXESS Deutschland GmbH LIP IPR 51369 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Zobel, Manfred, et al LANXESS Deutschland GmbH LIP IPR 51369 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1994/08] | Zobel, Manfred, Dr., et al BAYER AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1989/06] | Zobel, Manfred, Dr. BAYER AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 88111935.8 | 25.07.1988 | [1989/06] | Priority number, date | DE19873726265 | 07.08.1987 Original published format: DE 3726265 | [1989/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0302339 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0302339 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0302339 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/39] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0302339 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65D65/40, B32B27/32 | [1990/29] | CPC: |
B32B27/32 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B65D65/40 (KR);
B32B2307/31 (US);
B32B2307/7242 (US);
B32B2323/10 (US);
B32B2553/00 (US);
Y10S428/91 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1334 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1341 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2826 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1989/06] | B65D65/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/06] | Title | German: | Siegelbare Mehrschichtfolie mit verbesserter Transparenz | [1989/06] | English: | Sealable sandwich film with improved transparency | [1989/06] | French: | Feuille à plusieurs couches scellable avec translucidité améliorée | [1989/06] | Examination procedure | 25.07.1988 | Examination requested [1989/06] | 06.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.06.1994
09.08.1994
ADMISSIBLE Hoechst AG Zentrale Patentabteilung D-65926 FRANKFURT AM MAIN / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.06.1994
09.08.1994
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST AG Zentrale Patentabteilung D-65926 FRANKFURT AM MAIN / DE | 16.08.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.02.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 27.11.1995 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 30.01.1996 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 21.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 01.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 27.12.1996 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.01.1997 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.04.1997 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 13.06.1997 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 29.09.1993 | AT | 25.07.1994 | ES | 26.07.1994 | SE | 26.07.1994 | CH | 31.07.1994 | LI | 31.07.1994 | [2004/37] |
Former [2000/04] | GR | 29.09.1993 | |
AT | 25.07.1994 | ||
SE | 26.07.1994 | ||
CH | 31.07.1994 | ||
LI | 31.07.1994 | ||
Former [1996/02] | AT | 25.07.1994 | |
SE | 26.07.1994 | ||
CH | 31.07.1994 | ||
LI | 31.07.1994 | ||
Former [1995/31] | SE | 26.07.1994 | |
CH | 31.07.1994 | ||
LI | 31.07.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | SE | 26.07.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2055688 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [AD]DE3247998 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]EP0213698 (SHELL OIL CO [US]); | [A]EP0217598 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]); | [XP]EP0255622 (WOLFF WALSRODE AG [DE]) |