EP0356531 - Water-resistant photographic-paper support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.07.1994 [1994/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FELIX SCHOELLER JR. GMBH & CO. KG Postfach 3667 D-49026 Osnabrück / DE | [1990/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuhnhäuser, Sigrid Dr. Schlossstrasse 16 D-4500 Osnabrück / DE | 02 /
Winiker, Robert Dr. Am Plessen 23 D-4507 Hasbergen / DE | [1990/10] | Representative(s) | Eggert, Hans-Gunther Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/10] | Eggert, Hans-Gunther, Dr. Räderscheidtstrasse 1 D-50935 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 88112205.5 | 28.07.1988 | [1990/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0356531 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0356531 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/79, D21H17/74, D21H17/28, D21H17/42, D21H17/44, D21H17/66 | [1993/28] | CPC: |
D21H19/54 (EP,US);
D21H19/64 (EP,US);
G03C1/79 (EP,US);
Y10T428/277 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31895 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31902 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31913 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1990/10] | G03C1/79, D21H17/74 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/10] | Title | German: | Wasserfester fotografischer Papierträger | [1990/10] | English: | Water-resistant photographic-paper support | [1990/10] | French: | Support photographique en papier résistant à l'eau | [1990/10] | Examination procedure | 08.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/27] | 07.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3400125 (SCHOELLER F JUN GMBH CO KG [DE]); | [Y]DE3210621 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD [JP]); | [A]DE3216840 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [AD]DE2515823 (SCHOELLER FELIX JUN FA); | [AD]DE3241599 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [AD]DE3543597 (SCHOELLER F JUN GMBH CO KG [DE]); | [A]EP0235564 (SCHOELLER F JUN GMBH CO KG [DE]) |