EP0310776 - Apparatus for signal transmission from a rotating element to a stationary element, particularly from a wheel of a vehicle to that vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WABCO Vermögensverwaltungs-GmbH Postfach 91 12 80 30432 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | For all designated states WABCO Vermögensverwaltungs-GmbH Postfach 91 12 80 D-30432 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1989/15] | For all designated states WABCO Westinghouse Fahrzeugbremsen GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 D-30453 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Höfler, Siegfried, Dipl.-Ing. Kleine Pfahlstrasse 8 D-3000 Hannover 1 / DE | 02 /
Singbartl, Günther, Ing. (grad.) Körtingstrasse 3 D-3000 Hannover 1 / DE | 03 /
Schmidt, Reinhard, Dipl.-Ing. Wiesenstrasse 1 D-3160 Lehrte / DE | [1989/15] | Representative(s) | Schrödter, Manfred WABCO GmbH Postfach 91 12 62 30432 Hannover / DE | [2009/40] |
Former [1993/17] | Schrödter, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. WABCO GmbH Postfach 91 12 80 D-30432 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1989/15] | Schrödter, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. WABCO Westinghouse Fahrzeugbremsen GmbH Postfach 91 12 80 D-30432 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 88112437.4 | 01.08.1988 | [1989/15] | Priority number, date | DE19873732078 | 24.09.1987 Original published format: DE 3732078 | [1989/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0310776 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0310776 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0310776 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01P3/488, B60C23/04, G08C17/00 | [1990/52] | CPC: |
B60C23/042 (EP);
G01P3/488 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/15] | G08C17/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/15] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Signalübertragung von einem Drehteil auf ein bezüglich des Drehteils drehfestes Teil insbesondere von einem Fahrzeugrad auf das Fahrzeug | [1989/15] | English: | Apparatus for signal transmission from a rotating element to a stationary element, particularly from a wheel of a vehicle to that vehicle | [1989/15] | French: | Dispositif de transmission de signaux d'une pièce rotative à une pièce stationnaire, en particulier d'une roue d'un véhicule sur ce véhicule | [1989/15] | Examination procedure | 19.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/03] | 28.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0117172 (RENAULT VEHICULES IND [FR]); | [Y]US3654601 (MUNSON ROBERT V, et al); | [AD]DE2813058 ; | [A]FR2526953 (CITROEN SA [FR]) |