blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0303145

EP0303145 - Motorised adjustable headrest for a dental treatment chair [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.06.1992
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.06.1992No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.08.1992 [1992/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/07]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
D-80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Stöckl, Klaus
Franz-Schubert-Strasse 10
D-6140 Bensheim 3 / DE
[1989/07]
Application number, filing date88112484.601.08.1988
[1989/07]
Priority number, dateDE1987372720414.08.1987         Original published format: DE 3727204
[1989/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0303145
Date:15.02.1989
Language:DE
[1989/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0303145
Date:14.08.1991
Language:DE
[1991/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.1988
ClassificationIPC:A61G15/00
[1989/07]
CPC:
A61G15/125 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT,   SE [1989/07]
TitleGerman:Motorisch verstellbare Kopfstütze für einen zahnärztlichen Behandlungsstuhl[1989/07]
English:Motorised adjustable headrest for a dental treatment chair[1989/07]
French:Appui-tête à réglage motorisé pour fauteuil de traitement dentaire[1989/07]
Examination procedure07.03.1989Examination requested  [1989/18]
13.12.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.01.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.04.1991Fee for grant paid
09.04.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.05.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1992/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3347255  (EMDA [DE]);
 [A]US4366985  (LEFFLER DENNIS F);
 [A]DE2932344  (RITTER AG);
 [A]DE3130780  (KEIPER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH [DE]);
 [AD]US4515406  (FUJIYAMA KUNIO [JP], et al);
 [AD]DE2541506  (KALTENBACH & VOIGT)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.