EP0302448 - Purifying process for solvents and apparatus for carrying out this process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.1990 [1990/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seitz Enzinger Noll Maschinenbau Aktiengesellschaft Neckarauer Strasse 140-162 D-68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/06] | For all designated states Seitz Enzinger Noll Maschinenbau Aktiengesellschaft Neckarauer Strasse 140-162 D-68163 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaiser, Klaus Rheinhessenstrasse 12 D-6551 Neu-Bamberg / DE | [1989/06] | Application number, filing date | 88112544.7 | 02.08.1988 | [1989/06] | Priority number, date | DE19883823652 | 13.07.1988 Original published format: DE 3823652 | DE19873725761 | 04.08.1987 Original published format: DE 3725761 | [1989/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0302448 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0302448 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/18, D06F43/00, B01D36/00 | [1989/06] | CPC: |
D06F43/085 (EP,US);
B01D29/01 (EP,US);
B01D29/843 (EP,US);
B01D35/185 (EP,US);
B01D29/84 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Reinigen von Lösungsmitteln sowie Filtereinrichtung zum Durchführen dieses Verfahrens | [1989/06] | English: | Purifying process for solvents and apparatus for carrying out this process | [1989/06] | French: | Procédé de nettoyage des solvants et dispositif pour effectuer ce procédé | [1989/06] | File destroyed: | 16.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.12.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/34] | 27.03.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE3427252 [ ] (CANON DENSHI KK [JP]); | DE1241404 [ ] (BOEWE BOEHLER & WEBER K G MASC); | FR2512261 [ ] (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]) |