EP0303890 - Withdrawal box [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R. SEELIG & HILLE Kevelaerer Strasse 21-23 D-40549 Düsseldorf / DE | [1989/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hinterreiter, Ignaz Ramsauerstrasse 119 A-4020 Linz / AT | [1989/08] | Representative(s) | Bringmann, Wolfgang Rheinallee 130 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | Bringmann, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Rheinallee 130 D-40545 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1990/28] | Bringmann, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Rheinallee 134 D-40545 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1989/08] | Bringmann, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. NEUMANN KROKE BEISKEN & PARTNER Königsallee 14-16 D-40212 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 88112578.5 | 03.08.1988 | [1989/08] | Priority number, date | AT19870002103 | 21.08.1987 Original published format: AT 210387 | [1989/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0303890 | Date: | 22.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0303890 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0303890 | Date: | 04.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A47F1/08, B65D83/08 | [1990/22] | CPC: |
A47F1/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/08] | A47F1/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT [1989/08] | Title | German: | Entnahmebox | [1989/08] | English: | Withdrawal box | [1989/08] | French: | Boîte-distributeur | [1989/08] | Examination procedure | 21.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/47] | 20.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 04.11.1992 | ES | 15.02.1993 | [2004/03] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 04.11.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AT205910B ; | [A]US2965264 ; | [A]GB481003 ; | [A]US4166551 ; | [A]DE6917821U |