EP0303902 - Device for connecting cylindrical elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ERNO Raumfahrttechnik Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Hünefeldstrasse 1-5 D-28199 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/08] | For all designated states ERNO Raumfahrttechnik Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Hünefeldstrasse 1-5 D-28199 Bremen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hüssler, Walter, Dr. Ligusterweg 10 D-2805 Stuhr 4 / DE | [1989/08] | Application number, filing date | 88112687.4 | 04.08.1988 | [1989/08] | Priority number, date | DE19873727448 | 18.08.1987 Original published format: DE 3727448 | [1989/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0303902 | Date: | 22.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0303902 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0303902 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16L33/04, F16B2/08 | [1989/08] | CPC: |
F16B2/08 (EP,US);
B64G1/641 (US);
B64G1/642 (EP);
B64G1/645 (US);
B64G1/6457 (EP);
F16L23/08 (EP,US);
F16L33/04 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1441 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1449 (EP,US);
Y10T24/44239 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/08] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verbinden zylindrischer Bauteile | [1989/08] | English: | Device for connecting cylindrical elements | [1989/08] | French: | Dispositif pour le raccordement d'éléments cylindriques | [1989/08] | Examination procedure | 22.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/33] | 05.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH302653 (ROTENBURGER METALLWERKE RUDOLF [DE]); | [A]GB885996 (KAC LTD); | [A]FR1543373 ; | [A]CH534311 (VON ROLL AG [CH]); | [A]DE2361412 (CANNING BRETT LTD) |