EP0303186 - Aryl phosphorus derivatives, their preparation and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1994 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.1994 [1994/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/07] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wuest, Hans-Heiner, Dr. Unteres Bieth 10 D-6915 Dossenheim / DE | 02 /
Janssen, Bernd, Dr. Leuschnerstrasse 18a D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1989/07] | Application number, filing date | 88112704.7 | 04.08.1988 | [1989/07] | Priority number, date | DE19873726806 | 12.08.1987 Original published format: DE 3726806 | [1989/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0303186 | Date: | 15.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0303186 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0303186 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/40, C07F9/38, C07F9/32, C07F9/30, C07F9/53, A61K31/66 | [1989/07] | CPC: |
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07F9/3229 (EP,US);
C07F9/3834 (EP,US);
C07F9/4021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/07] | Title | German: | Arylphosphorderivate, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung | [1989/07] | English: | Aryl phosphorus derivatives, their preparation and their use | [1989/07] | French: | Dérivés arylphosphorés, leur préparation et utilisation | [1989/07] | Examination procedure | 10.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/36] | 03.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0176050 (BASF AG [DE]) |