EP0314884 - Mop pad [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.1992 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.02.1993 [1993/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Floordress Reinigungsgeräte GmbH Lorcher Strasse 30 D-73547 Lorch / DE | [1989/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schunter, Roland Birkenstrasse 9 D-7073 Lorch-Waldhausen / DE | [1989/19] | Representative(s) | Wilk, Hans-Christoph C/o Henkel KGaA TTP/Patentabteilung 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | Wilk, Hans-Christof, Dr. c/o Henkel KGaA TTP/Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1991/41] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1989/19] | Leyh, Hans, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Berendt, Leyh & Hering Innere Wiener Strasse 20 D-81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88112706.2 | 04.08.1988 | [1989/19] | Priority number, date | DE19873737414 | 04.11.1987 Original published format: DE 3737414 | [1989/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0314884 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0314884 | Date: | 12.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A47L13/20 | [1989/19] | CPC: |
A47L13/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [1991/49] |
Former [1989/19] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Wischbezug für Fussbodenwischgerät | [1989/19] | English: | Mop pad | [1989/19] | French: | Tête de balai à franges | [1989/19] | Examination procedure | 26.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/34] | 09.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4010508 [ ] (KOMATSU TOSHIYOSHI); | GB2035064 [ ] (JANI JACK LTD); | GB1604448 [ ] (JANI JACK LTD); | EP0101851 [ ] (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | DE3246161 [ ] (OSTERMANN MOP WERKE [DE]); | GB2171293 [ ] (DUSKIN CO LTD) |