EP0303932 - Fluor-free super opaque enamel frits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.1993 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.11.1993 [1993/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/08] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Joseph, Werner, Dr. Ludwig Aschoff Strasse 20 D-5000 Köln 80 / DE | 02 /
Schittenhelm, Hans-Joachim, Dr. Walter-Flex-Strasse 6 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | [1989/08] | Application number, filing date | 88112883.9 | 08.08.1988 | [1989/08] | Priority number, date | DE19873727644 | 19.08.1987 Original published format: DE 3727644 | [1989/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0303932 | Date: | 22.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0303932 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0303932 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C03C8/08 | [1989/08] | CPC: |
C03C8/08 (EP,US);
C04B35/481 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/08] | Title | German: | Fluorfreie Superopakemailfritten | [1989/08] | English: | Fluor-free super opaque enamel frits | [1989/08] | French: | Frittes d'émail super-opaques exemptes de fluor | [1989/08] | Examination procedure | 08.08.1988 | Examination requested [1989/08] | 21.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP58005854 ; | [X]PL89218 ; | [A]PL87446 ; | [X]US3216847 (ARMANT DAVID L); | [A]FR1482766 (BAYER AG) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 99, No. 6, 8. August 1983, Seite 248, Zusammenf. 42500n; "Frit compositions for coating on stainless steel." & JP-A-58 005 854 (Nippon Felt Co, NGK Insulators), veroff. 2.2.'83, & JP58005854 A 00000000 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 90, No. 22, 28. Mai 1979, Seite 314, Zusammenf. 173473t; J. Wieczorek et al.: "Titanium enamel for coating steel objects." & PL-A-89 218 (Rybnickie Zaklady Wyrobow Metalowych), veroff: 15-3-'77, & PL89218 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 90, No. 22, 28. Mai 1979, Seite 314, Zusammenf. 173476w; W. Nalepa et al.: "Fluorine-free titanium enamel" & PL-A-87 446 (Rybnickie Zaklady Wyrobow Metalowych), veroff. 31-3-77, & PL87446 A 00000000 | Examination | - A.F. DIETZEL : Emaillierung, Springer Verlag, 1981, Seite 150-151 |