EP0304715 - Process for the continuous purification of silicon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.1993 [1993/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/09] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurz, Günter, Dr. Niederrheinstrasse 288 D-4000 Düsseldorf 31 / DE | 02 /
Schwirtlich, Ingo, Dr. Hausweberstrasse 26 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
Gebauer, Klaus, Dr. Scheiblerstrasse 85 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | [1989/09] | Application number, filing date | 88112887.0 | 08.08.1988 | [1989/09] | Priority number, date | DE19873727646 | 19.08.1987 Original published format: DE 3727646 | [1989/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0304715 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0304715 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/02 | [1989/09] | CPC: |
C01B33/037 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT [1989/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur kontinuierlichen Raffination von Silicium | [1989/09] | English: | Process for the continuous purification of silicon | [1989/09] | French: | Procédé de purification continue de silicium | [1989/09] | Examination procedure | 08.08.1988 | Examination requested [1989/09] | 24.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3442622 (MONNIER ROBERT, et al); | [AD]US4298423 (LINDMAYER JOSEPH); | [A]DE3405613 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]DE3504723 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |