EP0305774 - Ion exchange resin modified by thiazolines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.1991 [1991/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/10] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rudolph, Udo, Dr. Scheiblerstrasse 101 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
Wulff, Claus, Dr. Richard-Strauss-Strasse 21 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
Hinz, Jürgen, Dr. Kemmerhofstrasse 181 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 04 /
Bachem, Norbert, Dr. Jentgesallee 43 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | [1989/10] | Application number, filing date | 88112921.7 | 09.08.1988 | [1989/10] | Priority number, date | DE19873727641 | 19.08.1987 Original published format: DE 3727641 | [1989/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0305774 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0305774 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01J31/10, C07C37/20 | [1989/10] | CPC: |
B01J31/10 (EP,US);
C07C37/20 (EP,US);
B01J2231/347 (EP,US);
Y02P20/52 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C37/20, C07C39/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/10] | Title | German: | Mit Thiazolinen modifizierte Ionenaustauscher | [1989/10] | English: | Ion exchange resin modified by thiazolines | [1989/10] | French: | Echangeur d'ions modifié par des thiazolines | [1989/10] | Examination procedure | 10.08.1988 | Examination requested [1989/10] | 20.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1183564 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [A]DE2422532 (COMBINATUL PETROCHIMIC BORZEST [RO]); | [A]US4396728 (FALER GARY R); | [A]EP0023325 (BAYER AG [DE]) |