EP0304727 - Supporting head particularly for machining plates of glass, marble or the like of any size [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.1993 [1993/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Z. BAVELLONI S.p.A. Via Milano 73 I-22070 Bregnano (Como) / IT | [1989/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bavelloni, Franco Via Mazzini 7 I-22070 Appiano Gentile Como / IT | [1989/09] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/09] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 88112994.4 | 10.08.1988 | [1989/09] | Priority number, date | IT19870021735 | 27.08.1987 Original published format: IT 2173587 | IT19880019054 | 12.01.1988 Original published format: IT 1905488 | [1989/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0304727 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0304727 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0304727 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B24B9/10 | [1989/09] | CPC: |
B24B9/107 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19679 (EP,US);
Y10T82/2552 (EP,US);
Y10T82/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1989/09] | Title | German: | Haltekopf, insbesondere zum Bearbeiten von Platten in jeder Grösse aus Glas, Marmor oder dergleichen | [1989/09] | English: | Supporting head particularly for machining plates of glass, marble or the like of any size | [1989/09] | French: | Tête de support, en particulier pour l'usinage de plaques de toutes tailles en verre, marbre ou similaire | [1989/09] | Examination procedure | 17.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/42] | 05.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB788260 (ALBERT FEZER); | [A]DE1179475 (EBAUCHES SA); | [A]DE3338240 (BAVELLONI Z SPA [IT]); | [A]FR2545025 (BAUDIN SA ETS [FR]) |