EP0303250 - Novel pyrazinoxide compound of NF-1616-904 and a pharmaceutical composition containing the same and a process for its preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.04.1994 [1994/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 9, Kandatsukasa-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0048 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/07] | For all designated states OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 9, Kandatsukasa-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakano, Yoshimasa 37-2, Aza Higashino Kasagi Aizumicho Itano-gun Tokushima-ken / JP | 02 /
Sugawara, Michiharu 1-79, Aza Shimozao Shingirai Kitajimacho Itano-gun Tokushima-ken / JP | 03 /
Uetsuki, Setsuyoshi 17-1, Sakosanbancho Tokushima-shi / JP | 04 /
Izawa, Taketoshi 65-6, Aza Minamikawamukai Hiroshima Matsushigecho Itano-gun Tokushima-ken / JP | 05 /
Kawaguchi, Tomoyuki 463-10, Kagasuno Kawauchicho Tokushima-shi / JP | 06 /
Wada, Akira 463-10, Kagasuno Kawauchicho Tokushima-shi / JP | [1989/07] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/07] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88112999.3 | 10.08.1988 | [1989/07] | Priority number, date | JP19870201537 | 11.08.1987 Original published format: JP 20153787 | [1989/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0303250 | Date: | 15.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0303250 | Date: | 11.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0303250 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/06, C12P1/02 | [1989/07] | CPC: |
C07D403/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C12P17/165 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/07] | Title | German: | Pyrazinoxid-Verbindung aus NF-1616-904, diese enthaltende Arzneimittelzubereitung und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1989/07] | English: | Novel pyrazinoxide compound of NF-1616-904 and a pharmaceutical composition containing the same and a process for its preparation | [1989/07] | French: | Dérivés pyrazinoxyde de NF-1616-904, composition pharmaceutique le contenant et son procédé de préparation | [1989/07] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 27.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 27.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0181152 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 95, 1981, page 738, abstract no. 7743q, Columbus, Ohio, US; T. KANMERA et al.: "Cyclic peptides. IX. Asymmetric hydrogenation of alpha,beta-dehydroamino acid residue in cyclodipeptides and preparation of optically pure alpha-amino acids", & INT. J. PEPT. PROTEIN RES. 1980, 16(4), 280-90 |