EP0303268 - A method for making metal structures corrosion,sound and vibration-proof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.1994 [1994/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NAGOYA OILCHEMICAL CO., LTD. 213-5 Honowari Minamishibata-cho Tokai-shi Aichi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/07] | For all designated states NAGOYA OILCHEMICAL CO., LTD. 213-5 Honowari Minamishibata-cho Tokai-shi Aichi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horiki, Seinosuke c/o NAGOYA OILCHEMICAL CO., LTD. 213-5, Honowari Minamishibata-cho Tokai-shi Aichi / JP | 02 /
Makino, Reiji c/o NAGOYA OILCHEMICAL CO., LTD. 213-5, Honowari Minamishibata-cho Tokai-shi Aichi / JP | [1989/07] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/07] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88113062.9 | 11.08.1988 | [1989/07] | Priority number, date | JP19870201309 | 12.08.1987 Original published format: JP 20130987 | JP19870239249 | 24.09.1987 Original published format: JP 23924987 | [1989/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0303268 | Date: | 15.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0303268 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/20, B60R13/08, B05D1/32, B05C21/00 | [1989/07] | CPC: |
B05B12/20 (EP);
B05B12/26 (EP);
B05D1/32 (EP,KR);
B62D25/2072 (EP);
B60R13/0861 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/07] | Title | German: | Methode, um Metallstrukturen korrosionsbeständig, schalldicht und erschütterungssicher zu machen | [1989/07] | English: | A method for making metal structures corrosion,sound and vibration-proof | [1989/07] | French: | Méthode pour faire des structures en métal anticorrosif insonore et résistant aux vibrations | [1989/07] | Examination procedure | 01.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/39] | 21.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1451734 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG); | [Y]EP0207720 (NAGOYA OILCHEMICAL [JP]); | [A]GB2143463 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]US4255482 (UDAGAWA NOBUO); | [A]DE2034180 |