EP0306726 - Data buffer apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.1993 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.05.1993 [1993/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHARP MICROELETRONICS TECHNOLOGY, INC. 312 SE Stonemill Drive Vancouver Washington 98684 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/11] | For all designated states SHARP MICROELETRONICS TECHNOLOGY, INC. 312 SE Stonemill Drive Vancouver Washington 98684 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spaderna, Dieter W. 18030 Southwest Broadoak Boulevard Aloha, Oregon 97007 / US | 02 /
Miller, Jeffrey L. 7014 Northwest 44th Circle Vancouver, Washington 98661 / US | [1989/11] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Roland, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/11] | Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 W-8000 München 40 / DE | Application number, filing date | 88113087.6 | 11.08.1988 | [1989/11] | Priority number, date | US19870093969 | 08.09.1987 Original published format: US 93969 | [1989/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0306726 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0306726 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11C7/00, G06F5/06 | [1989/11] | CPC: |
G06F5/16 (EP,US);
G11C7/103 (EP,US);
G11C7/1051 (EP,US);
G11C7/106 (EP,US);
G11C8/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/11] | Title | German: | Datenpuffervorrichtung und -verfahren | [1989/11] | English: | Data buffer apparatus and method | [1989/11] | French: | Méthode et système tampon de données | [1989/11] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 07.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 25.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/19] | 04.12.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]JPS62209791 (NEC CORP, et al); | [A]WO8702819 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [A]US4096565 (RUCKDESCHEL HERMANN, et al) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 17, no. 3, August 1974, pages 933-934, New York, US; T.A. WILLIAMS: "High-speed random-access memory with simultaneous read/write operation" |