EP0309706 - Aircraft ground-handling vehicle with a hold-back device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.05.1993 [1993/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krauss-Maffei Aktiengesellschaft Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 2 80997 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/14] | For all designated states Krauss-Maffei Aktiengesellschaft Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 2 D-80997 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pollner, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Fritz-Reuter-Strasse 36 D-8000 München 60 / DE | 02 /
Trummer, Gregor, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Alpenblick 5 D-8134 Aschering / DE | 03 /
Mölzer, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Geranienweg 7 D-8061 Schwabhausen / DE | [1989/14] | Application number, filing date | 88113128.8 | 12.08.1988 | [1989/14] | Priority number, date | DE19873732645 | 28.09.1987 Original published format: DE 3732645 | [1989/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0309706 | Date: | 05.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0309706 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0309706 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B64F1/22 | [1989/14] | CPC: |
B64F1/227 (EP,US);
B64F1/22 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/14] | Title | German: | Schleppfahrzeug für Flugzeuge Niederhaltesystem | [1989/14] | English: | Aircraft ground-handling vehicle with a hold-back device | [1989/14] | French: | Tracteur de piste pour avion avec un dispositif serre-flanc | [1989/14] | Examination procedure | 05.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/31] | 03.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2812434 (SECMAFER BUCHELAY SA); | [A]DE3327629 (KRAUSS MAFFEI AG [DE]); | [A]DE3521429 (KRAUSS MAFFEI AG [DE]); | [AD]DE3534045 (KRAUSS MAFFEI AG [DE]) |